Global Patent Index - EP 1243354 A2

EP 1243354 A2 2002-09-25 - Apparatus for hydromechanical deep-drawing of metal sheet

Title (en)

Apparatus for hydromechanical deep-drawing of metal sheet

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum hydromechanischen Tiefziehen eines Metallbleches

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l' emboutissage profond hydromécanique de tôles

Publication

EP 1243354 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006238 A

Priority

DE 10114629 A

Abstract (en)

Device for hydromechanical deep drawing of a metal sheet (20) comprises a first tool (11) having a shape contour; and a second tool (12) in the form of a water box forming an inner fluid chamber (21). The water box has a side wall (13) detachedly connected to a base plate (14). The side wall comprises a supporting part (15) and a pressure ring (19) arranged on the outer side of the supporting part facing away from the first tool. A contour plate (17) is arranged on the supporting part and the pressure ring to clamp the supporting part and the pressure ring against the base plate. Preferred Features: An outer fluid chamber (22) delimited by the base plate and the contour plate is formed between the supporting part and the pressure ring and is connected to the inner fluid chamber.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum hydraulischen Tiefziehen eines Metallbleches (20) besitzt ein 1. Werkzeug (11), das eine Formkontur aufweist, und ein 2. Werkzeug (12) in Form eines einen inneren Fluidraum (21) bildenden Wasserkastens mit einer Bodenplatte (14) und einer umlaufenden, in lösbarer Weise dicht auf der Bodenplatte (14) angebrachten Seitenwand (13). Das umzuformende Blech (20) kann in einer den inneren Fluidraum (21) überspannenden Weise auf die Seitenwand (13) aufgelegt und mittels eines Blechhalters (16) fluiddicht gegen die Seitenwand (13) gespannt werden. Um in einfacher Weise eine Anpassung des 2. Werkzeug (12) an verschiedene Bauteilformen zu ermöglichen, umfaßt die Seitenwand (13) zumindest ein auf der Bodenplatte (14) aufgelagertes Stützteil (15) und einen Druckring (19), der auf der dem 1. Werkzeug (11) abgewandten Außenseite des Stützteils (15) in Abstand zu diesem angeordnet ist, wobei auf das Stützteil (15) und den Druckring (19) eine von einer Spannvorrichtung (18) beaufschlagte Konturplatte (17) dichtend aufgelagert ist, über die das Stützteil (15) und das Dichtungsteil (19) gegen die Bodenplatte (14) gespannt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243354 A2 20020925; EP 1243354 A3 20030716; DE 10114629 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040117

2004-05-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21D 26/02 A

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21D 22/20 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI