Global Patent Index - EP 1243359 A1

EP 1243359 A1 2002-09-25 - Blind-rivet tool

Title (en)

Blind-rivet tool

Title (de)

Blindnietgerät

Title (fr)

Outil à poser des rivets borgnes

Publication

EP 1243359 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004053 A

Priority

  • DE 10111983 A
  • DE 10116525 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002125292A1] A blind riveting device for placing blind rivets includes a device head, wherein an opening for receiving a rivet bolt and a suction device for producing a negative pressure for holding the rivet bolt in the opening are arranged in the head. A control unit for switching the suction device on and off by an actuating element is provided at a handle which is connected to the head. For facilitating the manipulation of the blind riveting device, the actuating element can be locke din a switched-on position.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Blindnietgerät zum Setzen von Blindnieten angegeben mit einem Gerätekopf (2), in dem eine Öffnung (4) zur Aufnahme eines Nietdorns und eine Ansauganordnung (9) zur Erzeugung eines Unterdrucks angeordnet ist, die den Nietdorn in der Öffnung festhält, und mit einer Steuereinrichtung zum Ein- und Ausschalten der Ansauganordnung (9) mit einem Betätigungselement (6) an einem Haltegriff (3), der mit dem Gerätekopf (2) verbunden ist. Man möchte die Handhabung erleichtern. Hierzu ist das Betätigungselement (6) in einer Einschaltposition arretierbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 15/06; B21J 15/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/10 (2006.01); B21J 15/06 (2006.01); B21J 15/22 (2006.01); B21J 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/22 (2013.01); B21J 15/105 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53739 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53748 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243359 A1 20020925; EP 1243359 B1 20060524; AT 327065 T 20060615; CZ 296601 B6 20060412; ES 2260343 T3 20061101; PL 200424 B1 20090130; PL 352348 A1 20020923; US 2002125292 A1 20020912; US 6918279 B2 20050719

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160224

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160223

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160223

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160223

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-11-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160223

2016-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 327065 T

- Effective date: 20160223

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2260343 T3

2006-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060605

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT NL

2006-05-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT NL

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020803

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI