Global Patent Index - EP 1243362 A2

EP 1243362 A2 2002-09-25 - Process and device for manufacturing hot strip in a twin roll continuous casting machine

Title (en)

Process and device for manufacturing hot strip in a twin roll continuous casting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Warmband mittels Zweirollen-Dünnbandgiessanlagen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de fabrication de feuillard à chaud dans une machine de coulée continue de type à deux rouleaux

Publication

EP 1243362 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006223 A

Priority

DE 10114269 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10114269C1] Production of a hot strip comprises inserting liquid steel between two opposing rotating casting rollers in a two roller thin strip casting device; solidifying the strand skins to a defined thickness; and deforming to a final thickness. The strand skins are pressed together to form a hot strip with variable material cross-sections. An Independent claim is also included for a device for producing a hot strip. Preferred Features: The strand skins are pressed together in transition regions in point-form, line-form and/or planiform.

Abstract (de)

Die Aufgabe, ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Warmband (1) mittels Zweiröllen-Dünnbandgießanlagen (2) anzugeben, mit welchen eine wesentliche Steigerung des Produktionsdurchsatzes "P" über die durch die Erstarrungszeit "t" der Stranghäute (14a; 14b) gesetzten Grenzen für herkömmliche Zweirollen-Dünnbandgießanlagen (2) möglich ist, wird im Wesentlichen dadurch gelöst, dass die beiden Stranghäute (14a; 14b) derart abschnittsweise definiert zusammengepreßt oder zueinander beabstandet werden, dass sich ein Warmband (1) mit örtlich begrenzten und variablen Materialquerschnitten ausbildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0622 (2013.01); B22D 11/0651 (2013.01); B21B 1/463 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10114269 C1 20020502; EP 1243362 A2 20020925; EP 1243362 A3 20031126

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-09-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI