Global Patent Index - EP 1243363 A2

EP 1243363 A2 2002-09-25 - Die-casting method and die-casting apparatus

Title (en)

Die-casting method and die-casting apparatus

Title (de)

Druckgiessverfahren und Druckgiessmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de coulée sous pression

Publication

EP 1243363 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02006385 A

Priority

JP 2001083085 A

Abstract (en)

A method of producing a die-cast article by die-casting, the die-cast article having at least one of an inner and an outer circumferential surface, the method comprising the steps of: preparing a mold assembly (224, 226; 400, 402; 500, 502) including a hollow portion (280, 410, 510) having a molding surface (300, 420, 530) for molding one of the inner and outer circumferential surfaces of the die-cast article; closing the mold assembly to define therein a mold cavity (236, 426, 540) having a configuration corresponding to that of the die-cast article; subjecting the hollow portion to an elastic deformation in a direction toward the one of the inner and outer circumferential surfaces of the die-cast article to be produced; introducing a molten metal into the mold cavity while the hollow portion is subjected to the elastic deformation; opening the mold assembly and permitting the elastic deformation to be removed from the hollow portion after the molten metal has solidified; and removing the die-cast article from the mold assembly. An apparatus for practicing the method is also disclosed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/24; B22D 17/20; B22D 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22C 9/06 (2006.01); B22C 9/10 (2006.01); B22C 9/24 (2006.01); B22D 17/20 (2006.01); B22D 17/22 (2006.01); B22D 17/24 (2006.01); B22D 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/24 (2013.01); B22D 17/20 (2013.01); B22D 17/2236 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243363 A2 20020925; EP 1243363 A3 20030305; BR 0200894 A 20021105; CN 1387967 A 20030101; JP 2002283003 A 20021002; KR 20020075200 A 20021004; US 2002153120 A1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-11-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI