Global Patent Index - EP 1243380 A2

EP 1243380 A2 2002-09-25 - Device for grinding edges of optical lenses

Title (en)

Device for grinding edges of optical lenses

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Randbearbeitung von optischen Linsen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'usinage des bords de lentilles ophtalmiques

Publication

EP 1243380 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006026 A

Priority

DE 10114239 A

Abstract (en)

The lens is clamped between two holder-shafts (10,12) which turn on a workpiece pivot axle. A first carriage (14) is longitudinally guided on a base frame (16). A second carriage (18) supports a spindle (20) with a machining appliance (22) for the edges of the optical lens. The second carriage is guided along the first carriage in a direction at right angles to the first direction. The O-shaped base frame encloses the first, O-shaped carriage and encloses the second carriage. On each side of the base frame is a linear guide (48) for the first carriage.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zur Randbearbeitung einer optischen Linse (L), die zwischen zwei fluchtenden, um eine Werkstückdrehachse (R) drehbaren Haltewellen (10, 12) einspannbar ist, offenbart, mit einem Z-Schlitten (14), der an einem Grundgestell (16) in einer zur Werkstückdrehachse parallelen Z-Richtung längsverschieblich geführt ist, und einem eine Werkzeugspindel (20) mit einem Randbearbeitungswerkzeug (22) tragenden X-Schlitten (18), welcher an dem Z-Schlitten in einer zur Z-Richtung senkrechten X-Richtung derart längsverschieblich geführt ist, daß das Randbearbeitungswerkzeug mit der Linse in Bearbeitungseingriff bringbar ist. Für einen industriellen Einsatz der Vorrichtung ist erfindungsgemäß das Grundgestell im wesentlichen O-förmig ausgebildet und umgibt den Z-Schlitten, der ebenfalls im wesentlichen O-förmig ausgebildet ist und den X-Schlitten umgibt. In Ergänzung oder alternativ dazu ist vorgesehen, daß an dem X-Schlitten eine zusätzliche Bearbeitungseinrichtung (28) angebracht ist, die mindestens ein weiteres Randbearbeitungswerkzeug (30) aufweist, welches von einer Parkposition in eine Bearbeitungsposition zwischen der Linse und dem Randbearbeitungswerkzeug an der Werkzeugspindel bewegbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/14; B24B 41/00; B24B 47/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 41/00 (2006.01); B24B 47/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/148 (2013.01); B24B 9/14 (2013.01); B24B 41/00 (2013.01); B24B 47/22 (2013.01); B24B 47/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243380 A2 20020925; EP 1243380 A3 20031015; EP 1243380 B1 20051019; AT 307007 T 20051115; AT 337889 T 20060915; DE 10114239 A1 20021002; DE 50204570 D1 20060302; DE 50208035 D1 20061012; EP 1616663 A1 20060118; EP 1616663 B1 20060830; ES 2250532 T3 20060416; ES 2271932 T3 20070416; US 2002168920 A1 20021114; US 6712671 B2 20040330

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SATISLOH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-17 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2250532 T3

2006-04-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-03-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204570 P 20060302

2006-02-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060109

2006-01-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-01-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060119

2005-11-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-09-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SATISLOH GMBH

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050607

2004-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040403

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 9/14 A

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 41/00 B

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 47/22 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI