Global Patent Index - EP 1243385 A1

EP 1243385 A1 2002-09-25 - A combined packaging and sheath for sharp edged tools

Title (en)

A combined packaging and sheath for sharp edged tools

Title (de)

Kombinierte Verpackung und Scheide für ein scharfkantiges Werkzeug

Title (fr)

Emballage combiné pour la vente et pour la protection d'un outil avec un bord affuté

Publication

EP 1243385 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02445038 A

Priority

SE 0100941 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a packaging for a tool with sharp edge, said packaging comprising a suspension device (3). The packaging also comprises a protective sheath (1) and means for supporting the tool (2) in different positions on the sheath, including a first position adapted for sales exposure in which at least a major part of the tool is free of the sheath and exposed for inspection by a prospective buyer, and a second position in which the tool is inserted in the sheath and ready to be handled by a user. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 29/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243385 A1 20020925; CN 1378967 A 20021113; NO 20021339 A 20020920; NO 20021339 D0 20020318; SE 0100941 D0 20010319; SE 0100941 L 20020920; SE 518693 C2 20021105; US 2002148746 A1 20021017

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ERIKSSON, ANDREAS

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JOHANSSON, ALF

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOEDERMAN, STAFFAN

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GARRAS, STAFFAN

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LINDBERG, STAFFAN

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLOOM, BERTIL

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENGLUND, TORD

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI