Global Patent Index - EP 1243398 A1

EP 1243398 A1 2002-09-25 - Mould for producing and ejecting moulded articles, in particular plastic moulded articles

Title (en)

Mould for producing and ejecting moulded articles, in particular plastic moulded articles

Title (de)

Werkzeug zur Herstellung und Entformung von Formteilen, insbesondere Kunststoff-Formteilen

Title (fr)

Moule pour fabriquer et éjecter des articles moulés, notamment des articles moulés en matière plastique

Publication

EP 1243398 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02006136 A

Priority

DE 10113327 A

Abstract (en)

An undercut (9c) on the outer surface of the molding (9) is formed by the internal faces of slides (1) in the tool. During demolding the angled slides move both axially and sideways relative to the tool axis to release themselves from the molded undercut.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Werkzeug zur Herstellung und Entformung von Formteilen (9), insbesondere Kunststoff-Formteilen, die in ihrem äusseren Bereich hinterfangen sind, wird die Guss- oder Spritzgussform von den Innenflächen (12) von Schiebern (1) gebildet. Die Schieber sind nach der Erfindung als Schrägschieber (1) ausgebildet, deren Bewegung zur Entformung in Achsrichtung erfolgt und dabei gleichzeitig eine seitwärts gerichtete Komponente nach schräg außen aufweist. Die Rückseiten (13) der Schrägschieber (1) sind zur Mittelachse (10) konisch ausgebildet und können zur Entformung an entsprechend konisch ausgebildeten Führungsflächen (15) in Führungsnuten (14') gleiten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 45/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/33 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/33 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243398 A1 20020925; DE 10113327 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060826

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENZI-BREUER, BIANCA

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPAAR-BREUER, JEANNETTE

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HENZI-BREUER, BIANCA

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SPAAR-BREUER, JEANNETTE

2004-04-14 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20040802

2003-09-03 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI