Global Patent Index - EP 1243409 A2

EP 1243409 A2 2002-09-25 - Combinatorial coating for developing novel materials

Title (en)

Combinatorial coating for developing novel materials

Title (de)

Kombinatorisches Beschichtungsverfahren zur Entwicklung neuer Materialien

Title (fr)

Procédé de revêtement combinatoire pour le développement de nouveaux matériaux

Publication

EP 1243409 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01000124 A

Priority

  • EP 01000124 A
  • EP 00201599 A

Abstract (en)

Methods and apparatus for rapid screening of layered materials, for a useful property. In the method at least two layered materials are applied on one single substrate. Preferably the materials are applied by coating from a coating composition and are multi-layered materials having at least two distinct layers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 31/00; B01J 19/00; B32B 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/00 (2013.01); B01J 19/0046 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00527 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00603 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00605 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0061 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00659 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00707 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00756 (2013.01); G03C 1/74 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243409 A2 20020925; EP 1243409 A3 20030514

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160503

2011-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STRATEGISCH INITIATIEF MATERIALEN VZW

2008-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLANDERS MATERIALS CENTRE VZW

2007-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V.

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060809

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI