Global Patent Index - EP 1243413 A1

EP 1243413 A1 2002-09-25 - Method of making a negative-working heat-sensitive lithographic printing plate precursor

Title (en)

Method of making a negative-working heat-sensitive lithographic printing plate precursor

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer negativarbeitenden, wärmeempfindlichen, lithographischen Druckplattenvorstufe

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un précurseur de type négatif d'une plaque d'impression lithographique thermosensible

Publication

EP 1243413 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02100128 A

Priority

  • EP 02100128 A
  • EP 01000059 A

Abstract (en)

A method of making a negative-working heat-sensitive lithographic printing plate precursor is disclosed, the method comprising the steps of (a)preparing an aqueous dispersion comprising particles of a hydrophobic thermoplastic polymer A which is not soluble or swellable in an aqueous alkaline developer and particles of a polymer B which is soluble or swellable in an aqueous alkaline developer but not soluble or swellable in water, wherein the glass transition temperature of polymer A is higher than the softening temperature of polymer B; (b)applying the aqueous dispersion on a lithographic substrate having a hydrophilic surface, thereby obtaining an image-recording layer; (c)overall heating the image-recording layer at a temperature which is higher than the softening temperature of polymer B without inducing coalescense of the particles of polymer A. The printing plate precursor has improved mechanical resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1025 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/06 (2013.01); B41C 2210/22 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); B41C 2210/262 (2013.01); B41M 5/366 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243413 A1 20020925; EP 1243413 B1 20040526

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130212

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60200521

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130212

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200521 P 20040701

2004-06-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VERMEERSCH, JOAN

2004-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN DAMME, MARC

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI