Global Patent Index - EP 1243414 A1

EP 1243414 A1 2002-09-25 - Printing method

Title (en)

Printing method

Title (de)

Druckverfahren

Title (fr)

Méthode d'impression

Publication

EP 1243414 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02003008 A

Priority

DE 10114250 A

Abstract (en)

The rotary printing machine comprises several printing cylinders (18,20) which can be placed against, and removed from the print by means of a regulator (32). A control periodically stops and starts at least one (20) of the printing cylinders during operation and within a time-span less than the time the printing cylinder takes to revolve, between the start and stop position. Each of the printing cylinders has its own motor on the axle of the printing cylinder.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Drucken auf einer Rotationsdruckmaschine mit mehreren Druckzylindem (18, 20; DZ1, DZ2, DZ3), die an einem durchlaufenden Bedruckstoff (44) anstellbar und von diesem abstellbar sind, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Drucklänge des gedruckten Bildes größer ist als die Umfangslänge des größten Druckzylinders (20; DZ1, DZ2, DZ3), daß das Druckbild in Elemente (50, 52; 62, 64, 66) aufgeteilt wird, die mit verschiedenen Druckzylindern gedruckt werden, und daß zumindest einer (20; DZ1, DZ2, DZ3) der Druckzylinder während des Druckbetriebs periodisch, jeweils mindestens für die Dauer einer Druckzylinderumdrehung, vom Bedruckstoff (44) abgestellt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 5/14 (2006.01); B41F 5/24 (2006.01); B41M 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 5/24 (2013.01); B41P 2217/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243414 A1 20020925; EP 1243414 B1 20070411; EP 1243414 B2 20141224; DE 10114250 A1 20020926; DE 50209888 D1 20070524; ES 2283476 T3 20071101; ES 2283476 T5 20150220; JP 2002326441 A 20021112; US 2002134267 A1 20020926; US 6796226 B2 20040928

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209888

2015-02-20 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2283476 T5

- Effective date: 20150220

2015-02-12 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50209888

- Effective date: 20141224

2014-12-24 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20141224

2014-12-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2014-12-24 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50209888

2013-05-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20130401

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120212

2012-08-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOBST BIELEFELD GMBH

2012-08-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOBST BIELEFELD GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FISCHER & KRECKE GMBH & CO. KG, 33609 BIELEFELD, DE

- Document: DE 50209888

- Effective date: 20120612

2012-08-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209888

- Representative's name: TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120612

2012-08-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209888

- Effective date: 20120612

2012-06-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209888

- Representative's name: TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GBR PATENTANWA, DE

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-11-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FISCHER & KRECKE GMBH

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071207

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-02-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COMEXI, SA

- Effective date: 20080111

2007-12-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-11-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070411

2007-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2283476 T3

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209888 P 20070524

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FISCHER & KRECKE GMBH & CO. KG

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020725

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI