Global Patent Index - EP 1243423 A2

EP 1243423 A2 2002-09-25 - Consumable module for an electronic device

Title (en)

Consumable module for an electronic device

Title (de)

Verbrauchsmodul für ein elektronisches Gerät

Title (fr)

Module consommable pour un dispositif électronique

Publication

EP 1243423 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02090085 A

Priority

DE 10114540 A

Abstract (en)

Ink cartridge (1) is mounted in a carrier (2) and has electrical connectors (4, 5, 14) for connecting it to a controller (8) via a contact element (6). The cartridge has a projection (11) with which the cartridge connects to the carrier to prevent its use with other types of carrier. The connectors and projection are designed so that if they are removed in an unauthorized manner, they will be at least partially destroyed.

Abstract (de)

Elektrisch betriebenes Verbrauchsmodul zum Einsetzen in eine Halterung (2) eines elektronischen Gerätes, insbesondere Tintenpatrone für die Druckeinrichtung einer Frankiermaschine, mit einer Verbrauchseinrichtung (9), damit verbundenen elektrischen Anschlusselementen (4, 5, 15), die Kontaktelemente (6) zum Verbinden des Verbrauchsmoduls (1) mit einer Verbrauchsmodulsteuerung (8) des Gerätes aufweisen, und einem zum Zusammenwirken mit der Halterung vorgesehenen Vorsprung (11) zum Verhindern des Einsetzens in andersartige Halterungen, wobei die Anschlusselemente (4, 5, 14) derart ausgebildet und/oder dem Vorsprung (11) zugeordnet sind, dass sie beim unautorisierten Entfernen des Vorsprungs (11) zumindest teilweise zerstört werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17553 (2013.01); B41J 2/17526 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243423 A2 20020925; EP 1243423 A3 20030723; EP 1243423 B1 20050907; DE 10114540 A1 20021002; DE 50204139 D1 20051013; US 2002135647 A1 20020926; US 6634740 B2 20031021

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070623

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-03-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-03-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-02-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060104

2005-12-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204139 P 20051013

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 2/175 A

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07B 17/00 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI