Global Patent Index - EP 1243431 A2

EP 1243431 A2 2002-09-25 - Sensor device for a franking machine

Title (en)

Sensor device for a franking machine

Title (de)

Sensoranordnung für eine Frankiermaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif capteur pour une machine à affranchir

Publication

EP 1243431 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02090090 A

Priority

DE 10114534 A

Abstract (en)

Electronic franking machine for generating a print image (3) has a main board (14) with one or more processing devices (12) connected to a sensor device (16) that detects when a moving component, such as the print head (2) has reached a given position. An activation element (17) mounted on the print head so that it activates the sensor device when the print head reaches the given spatial position.

Abstract (de)

Elektronisches Gerät zum Erzeugen eines Druckbildes (3), insbesondere Frankiermaschine, mit einer Hauptplatine (14) zur Aufnahme wenigstens einer Verarbeitungseinrichtung (12), wenigstens einer entfernt und beweglich zur Hauptplatine (14) angeordneten ersten Baueinheit (2, 8, 9; 19; 23.1) wenigstens einer mit der Verarbeitungseinrichtung (12) verbundenen Sensoreinrichtung (16; 22; 25; 16') zur Erfassung des Erreichens wenigstens einer vorgegebenen ersten Raumposition der beweglichen Baueinheit (2, 8, 9; 19; 23.1) und einem zum Zusammenwirken mit der Sensoreinrichtung (16; 22; 25; 16') vorgesehenen, mit der beweglichen Baueinheit (2, 8, 9; 19; 23.1) verbundenen Betätigungselement (17; 21; 24; 17'), wobei die Sensoreinrichtung (16; 22; 25; 16') auf der Hauptplatine (14) angeordnet ist und das Betätigungselement (17; 21; 24; 17') durch die Baueinheit (2, 8, 9; 19; 23.1) betätigbar oder fest mit der Baueinheit (2, 8, 9; 19; 23.1) verbunden ist sowie eine ausreichende Länge zum Betätigen der Sensoreinrichtung (16; 22; 25; 16') bei Erreichen der ersten Raumposition durch die bewegliche Baueinheit (2, 8, 9; 19; 23.1) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 29/393 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00661 (2013.01); B41J 29/393 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243431 A2 20020925; EP 1243431 A3 20030122; EP 1243431 B1 20070627; DE 10114534 A1 20021002; DE 50210363 D1 20070809

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50210363

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2007-12-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2007-10-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070911

2007-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210363 P 20070809

2007-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-06-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030516

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030207

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 29/02 A, 7B 41J 19/20 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI