Global Patent Index - EP 1243432 A1

EP 1243432 A1 2002-09-25 - Ink ribbon cassette

Title (en)

Ink ribbon cassette

Title (de)

Farbbandkassette

Title (fr)

Cassette à ruban encreur

Publication

EP 1243432 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02005218 A

Priority

DE 10113783 A

Abstract (en)

A colored band cassette consists of an endless band (2) which is at least twice the width of a normal band. Only one band section can be used during printing. A color application unit (4,6,7,9) applies the colors to the band sections. The color application unit dye container has an inner porous polyurethane foam layer.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Farbbandkassette, insbesondere zur Verwendung in einem Nadeldrucker, mit einem Farbband (2), das die Form eines endlosen Bandes aufweist, wobei das Band entweder als möbiusches Band ausgebildet ist oder mindestens die doppelte Breite eines normalen Bandes aufweist, wobei mindestens zwei gleich große Bandabschnitte (34, 35) vorhanden sind und wobei jeweils nur einer der Bandabschnitte beim Drucken beansprucht wird, und einer Farbauftragseinrichtung, die Farbe auf den jeweils druckbeanspruchten Bandabschnitt des Farbbands (2) wieder aufträgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 31/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 31/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 31/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243432 A1 20020925; CN 1190327 C 20050223; CN 1376586 A 20021030; DE 10113783 A1 20021017; DE 10113783 C2 20030814

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060221

2003-07-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH LI

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI