Global Patent Index - EP 1243441 A2

EP 1243441 A2 2002-09-25 - Device and method for binding printed products

Title (en)

Device and method for binding printed products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum binden von Druckprodukten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour relier des produits imprimés

Publication

EP 1243441 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006540 A

Priority

US 81463501 A

Abstract (en)

The book is conveyed in a direction (6) at right angles to the spine, ad is gripped by a gripper (28) which is then detached from the book. The spine-thrust piece (26), at the lower end of the pocket (20), is lowered in relation to the gripper. Each pocket has an angled reverse side (24), and the spine-thrust piece is movable from a collector to a release position. Each pocket has a clamp (27) beneath the reverse side, and has an operating lever (13) for the gripper.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Herstellen eines Buchrückens umfasst eine Vielzahl bewegbarer Taschen (20), wobei jede Tasche (20) eine abgewinkelte Rückseite (24), eine Greifvorrichtung und einen Rückenanschlag (26) an einem unteren Ende der Tasche zur Aufnahme des Rückens umfasst. Der Rückenanschlag (26) weist eine erste Sammelposition, eine zweite Position, in welcher der Rückenanschlag (26) bezüglich der Greifvorrichtung niedriger als in der Sammelposition angeordnet ist, den Rücken aber noch hält, und eine dritte Position auf, in welcher der Rückenanschlag (26) vom Rücken weggedreht ist. Ein Verfahren zum Bearbeiten eines Rückens wird ebenfalls bereitgestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42C 11/02; B65H 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 5/00 (2006.01); B42C 11/02 (2006.01); B65H 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42C 11/02 (2013.01); B65H 39/02 (2013.01); B65H 2301/3613 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4321 (2013.01); B65H 2405/50 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243441 A2 20020925; EP 1243441 A3 20040414; JP 2002331771 A 20021119; JP 4280454 B2 20090617; US 2002136618 A1 20020926; US 6547501 B2 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070219

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060113

2005-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOSS INTERNATIONAL AMERICAS, INC.

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040308

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 42C 11/02 A

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 39/02 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI