Global Patent Index - EP 1243502 A2

EP 1243502 A2 2002-09-25 - Landing craft with fixed and retractable azimuthing drives

Title (en)

Landing craft with fixed and retractable azimuthing drives

Title (de)

Landungsboot mit festen und einziehbaren Azimutalantrieben

Title (fr)

Engin de débarquement équipé de propulseurs azimutaux fixes et rétractables

Publication

EP 1243502 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02290575 A

Priority

US 81511201 A

Abstract (en)

A marine vessel (10) used for loading and offloading vehicles and cargo that has both excellent seakeeping and beaching properties. The vessel (10) is provided with azimuthing or steerable thrusters (20,22) below the waterline at the bow (12) and stem (14) of the ship, with the stern end thrusters (22) being retractable into the hull during beaching operations. Because the vessel (10) is beached "stem first" the bow (12) may be designed with better wave breaking and seakeeping features than are on prior landing craft designs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 35/54; B63H 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 27/00 (2006.01); B63B 27/14 (2006.01); B63B 35/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/54 (2013.01); B63B 27/00 (2013.01); B63B 27/143 (2013.01); B63B 2035/001 (2013.01); B63H 2025/425 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243502 A2 20020925; EP 1243502 A3 20031105; US 2002134290 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-09-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI