Global Patent Index - EP 1243507 A2

EP 1243507 A2 2002-09-25 - Method of operating a spinning space vehicle with varying rotation speed

Title (en)

Method of operating a spinning space vehicle with varying rotation speed

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb eines rotierenden Raumfahrzeugs mit variierender Rotationsgeschwindigkeit

Title (fr)

Méthode d'opération d'un engin spatial rotatif avec vitesse de rotation variable

Publication

EP 1243507 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004801 A

Priority

DE 10114085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10114085C1] The space vehicle operating method provides rotation of the space vehicle about a given body axis, with the rate of rotation slowed over a defined angular range when a device which cooperates with a heavenly body is in directed in alignment with the latter, e.g. when a communication device, measuring device, or examination device is aligned with a required heavenly body.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Raumfahrzeugs (1), das zumindest eine mit einem Himmelskörper zusammenwirkende Einrichtung (2,3) aufweist, wobei eine Rotation des Raumfahrzeuges um zumindest eine Körperachse des Raumfahrzeuges erfolgt. Die Rotation des Raumfahrzeuges wird verlangsamt, wenn die mit dem Himmelskörper zusammenwirkende Einrichtung im wesentlichen in Richtung des Himmelskörpers ausgerichtet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64G 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64G 1/28 (2006.01); B64G 1/36 (2006.01); B64G 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64G 1/281 (2013.01); B64G 1/285 (2013.01); B64G 1/363 (2013.01); B64G 1/443 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10114085 C1 20020725; EP 1243507 A2 20020925; EP 1243507 A3 20031119; EP 1243507 B1 20040929; US 2002171010 A1 20021121; US 6634604 B2 20031021

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090302

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-04-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050109

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201131 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS ASTRIUM GMBH

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI