Global Patent Index - EP 1243517 A1

EP 1243517 A1 2002-09-25 - Pellets storage container

Title (en)

Pellets storage container

Title (de)

Pellet-Lagerbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient de stockage de boulettes

Publication

EP 1243517 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01106892 A

Priority

EP 01106892 A

Abstract (en)

The rectangular container for fuel pellets is made from sheet metal. It has a hole (10) in one wall (4) or the lid (7), into which a discharge tube is inserted. The lower fifth of two walls is curved to assist downward flow of the pellets.

Abstract (de)

Pellet-Lagerbehälter mit einem Behältermantel (1) aus Blech, wobei der Behältermantel (1) aus einem Behälterboden (2), Behälterseitenwänden (3,4,5,6) und einem Behälterdeckel (7) besteht, die feuchtigkeitsdicht miteinander verbunden sind. Es ist zumindest eine rohrförmige Entnahmevorrichtung (9) für die Entnahme von Pellets vorgesehen, welche Entnahmevorrichtung (9) durch eine Öffnung (10) in einer Behälterseitenwand (3,4,5,6) oder durch eine Öffnung im Behälterdeckel (7) in den Behälterinnenraum ragt. Zumindest eine Behälterseitenwand (3,4,5,6) ist zumindest im unteren Fünftel des Behälterinnenraumes so eingerichtet, dass ein Nachrutschen der Pellets zum Behälterboden (2) hin gewährleistet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 6/28; B65D 6/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 6/28 (2006.01); B65D 6/40 (2006.01); B65D 8/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 7/40 (2013.01); B65D 7/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243517 A1 20020925; EP 1243517 B1 20031001; AT 251076 T 20031015; DE 50100711 D1 20031106; DK 1243517 T3 20031027

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040321

2004-03-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040320

2004-01-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031219

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100711 P 20031106

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK SE

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK SE

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011017

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI