Global Patent Index - EP 1243543 A2

EP 1243543 A2 2002-09-25 - Device for controlling yarn unwound from a reel

Title (en)

Device for controlling yarn unwound from a reel

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Regulierung des Garns beim Abwickeln von einer Spule

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour controler le fil pendant le déroulement d'une bobine

Publication

EP 1243543 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01129847 A

Priority

IT TO20001201 A

Abstract (en)

The device comprises a plurality of flexible linear units (17) hanging and subjected to the force of the weight of at least one gravity body (18) and which surround at least in part the windings of yarn on a reel (R) and docilely contain the windings, without obstructing unwinding of the free end of the yarn, which is pulled by a machine or loom supplied by the reel, said at least one gravity body (18) being mobile and suspended so to ensure the constant containment of windings of yarn of the reel (R) progressively as the diameter of the reel is reduced, keeping constantly the correct tension of said flexible hanging units (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 59/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/08 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243543 A2 20020925; EP 1243543 A3 20021002; IT 1320864 B1 20031210; IT TO20001201 A1 20020624; IT TO20001201 D0 20001222

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-04-09 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: S.A.M.M. S.R.L.

2003-04-09 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: FERRARI MARIO & C. S.N.C.

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI