Global Patent Index - EP 1243545 A2

EP 1243545 A2 2002-09-25 - Height adjustable supporting device

Title (en)

Height adjustable supporting device

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbare Stützvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support réglable en hauteur

Publication

EP 1243545 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005800 A

Priority

  • DE 10113399 A
  • DE 10116256 A
  • DE 10203130 A

Abstract (en)

The upper part (2) of the support comprises a load-carrier-unit (3) adjustable in height in relation to the lower part (1) by means of a spindle drive (14). The upper part has at least one arm (9) swivel mounted on the lower part and supporting the carrier unit . The spindle drive swivels the at least one arm and thereby adjusts the carrier unit's height. The carrier unit incorporates a platform (4) which has side barriers (5).

Abstract (de)

Höhenverstellbare Stützvorrichtung mit einem Unterteil (1) und einem Oberteil (2), das eine gegenüber dem Unterteil (1) vermittels eines Spindeltriebs (14) höhenverstellbare Trageeinheit (3) für die Aufnahme von Lasten umfasst, wobei das Oberteil (2) mindestens einen Arm (9) umfasst, der schwenkbar an dem Unterteil (1) angebracht ist, und die Trageeinheit (3) beabstandet von dem Unterteil (1) unterstützt, und dass der Spindeltrieb (14) derart an dem mindestens einen Arm (9) angreift, dass vermittels des Spindeltriebs (14) der mindestens eine Arm (9) verschwenkt und damit die Trageeinheit (3) entsprechend höhenverstellt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 5/02; B66C 23/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/48 (2006.01); B66F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/48 (2013.01); B66F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29910518 U1 19990812 - MUELLER & BAUM [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243545 A2 20020925; EP 1243545 A3 20051116

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-03-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-07-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-11-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI