Global Patent Index - EP 1243548 A2

EP 1243548 A2 2002-09-25 - Beverage dispensing apparatus

Title (en)

Beverage dispensing apparatus

Title (de)

Getränkespender

Title (fr)

Distributeur de boisson

Publication

EP 1243548 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01205036 A

Priority

  • EP 98937716 A
  • NL 1006948 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911561A1] The invention relates to a beverage dispensing apparatus comprising a housing (1) having a chamber (3) in which a beverage container (5) can be placed, which container has at least one deformable wall (16) and has an outlet (8) to which a beverage delivery line (7, 34) to a tapping device (6) can be connected, locking and sealing means (10, 12, 13) for closing a pressure space (17) in an airtight manner, which pressure space is situated between an outer wall (16) of the beverage container (5) and an inner wall (15) of the chamber (3), and pressurizing means (16) for pressurizing the pressure space (17) to force beverage out of the container via the outlet. To improve the sealing and locking and to make the apparatus convenient to operate for the user the locking and sealing means (10, 12, 13) arranged between the outer wall (16) of the beverage container and a wall of the chamber. As a result of this, the pressure chamber is disposed between the inner wall (16) of the chamber and the outer wall (15) of the container, the outlet (8) of the container (5) being situated outside the pressure space (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/86 (2006.01); B67D 1/04 (2006.01); B67D 1/08 (2006.01); B67D 1/14 (2006.01); B67D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/0412 (2013.01); B67B 7/28 (2013.01); B67D 1/0462 (2013.01); B67D 1/0835 (2013.01); B67D 1/0869 (2013.01); B67D 1/0878 (2013.01); B67D 1/1405 (2013.01); B67D 2001/0089 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9520540 A1 19950803 - FABBRO ALBERTO [IT], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911561 A1 19990311; CN 1168653 C 20040929; CN 1239464 A 19991222; DE 69820846 D1 20040205; DE 69820846 T2 20040617; DE 69832211 D1 20051208; DE 69832211 T2 20060727; DE 69832211 T3 20130814; DE 69840304 D1 20090115; DE 69841632 D1 20100602; EP 0935585 A1 19990818; EP 0935585 B1 20040102; EP 1213258 A2 20020612; EP 1213258 A3 20020626; EP 1213258 B1 20051102; EP 1213258 B2 20130102; EP 1243548 A2 20020925; EP 1243548 A3 20021009; EP 1243548 B1 20081203; EP 1243548 B2 20130731; EP 1621514 A2 20060201; EP 1621514 A3 20060405; EP 1621514 B1 20100421; ES 2209176 T3 20040616; ES 2247000 T3 20060301; ES 2247000 T5 20130416; ES 2317870 T3 20090501; ES 2317870 T5 20131119; ES 2344459 T3 20100827; HK 1028011 A1 20050520; HK 1047423 A1 20060203; HK 1049323 A1 20090403; JP 2001504786 A 20010410; JP 3574144 B2 20041006; RU 2237009 C2 20040927

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-11-19 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2317870 T5

- Effective date: 20131119

2013-09-19 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69840304

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-31 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-10-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CARLSBERG BREWERIES A/S

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2317870 T3

2009-04-03 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1049323

2009-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69840304 P 20090115

2008-12-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0935585 P

2008-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040920

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030314

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 935585

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT