Global Patent Index - EP 1243549 A1

EP 1243549 A1 2002-09-25 - Device and method for handling a hose

Title (en)

Device and method for handling a hose

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Handhabung eines Zapfschlauches

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la manipulation d'un tuyau

Publication

EP 1243549 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02445039 A

Priority

SE 0100993 A

Abstract (en)

A device for handling of a hose (5), which device allows pulling out of the hose (5) from a hose storage space (6) and is adapted to return the hose (5) to the hose storage space (6). The device comprises at least two sequentially cooperating hose returning means (8, 9) to allow pulling out and returning of the hose. Moreover, a method for handling of a hose as well as a fuel pump assembly are described. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/365

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/40 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243549 A1 20020925; EP 1243549 B1 20070606; DE 60220467 D1 20070719; DE 60220467 T2 20071031; SE 0100993 D0 20010322; SE 0100993 L 20020923; SE 518625 C2 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150322

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150322

2015-12-01 [REG SE EUG] EP PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150323

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150322

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60220467

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140321

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140317

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080307

2007-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60220467 P 20070719

2007-06-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2007-06-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030321

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI