Global Patent Index - EP 1243662 A2

EP 1243662 A2 2002-09-25 - Device for the continuous treatment of leather and similar material, in particular a vibration staking machine for making leather supple

Title (en)

Device for the continuous treatment of leather and similar material, in particular a vibration staking machine for making leather supple

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Durchlaufbearbeitung von Leder und ähnlichen Materialien, inbesondere Vibrationsstollmaschine zur Flexibilisierung von Leder

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement en continu du cuir et matière similaire, en particulier une machine à palisonner par vibrations pour assouplir le cuir

Publication

EP 1243662 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01125988 A

Priority

DE 10054893 A

Abstract (en)

A leather staking machine reduces the stiffness in leather by pummelling. The machine has continually-operated superimposed sandwich-feed conveyer belts which transport leather (L) through the assembly. The belts are especially flexible and are held by side-grips that spread the belts (B1, B2) sideways (LK) as they continue in motion (P). The belt has peripheral beading (RV) that, on entering the staking machine, is trapped in open-ended guides (QSF) and pulled sideways under the control of roller guides. The sideways pulling action is effected as the sandwiched leather passes through the pummelling zone. The full assembly consists of a series of such leather staking machines operated in a single line.

Abstract (de)

Gattungsmerkmale: Einrichtung zur Durchlaufbearbeitung von Leder und ähnlichen Materialien, insbesondere Vibrations-Stollmaschine zur Flexibilisierung von Leder. Dabei ist eine Durchlaufbahn (DB) vorgesehen, die Transportmittel (TM) für das zu bearbeitende Leder (L) aufweist und an der mindestens ein Bearbeitungsbereich gebildet ist. Die Transportmittel (TM) umfassen mindestens ein umlaufendes Transportband (B1, B2) das wenigstens teilweise flexibel dehnbar ausgebildet ist. Erfindungsaufgabe: Schaffung einer Bearbeitungseinrichtung für Leder und dergl., die sich durch verbesserte Sicherheit gegen Durchlaufstörungen auszeichnet. Lösungsmerkmale: Es sind an dem Transportband (B1, B2) angreifende Querstreckungsmittel vorgesehen, die einen abschnittsweise in Transportrichtung divergierenden Verlauf der Band-Längskanten (LK) mit entsprechend zunehmender Bandbreite erzeugen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14B 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243662 A2 20020925; EP 1243662 A3 20030514; DE 10054893 A1 20030320

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040127

2004-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI