Global Patent Index - EP 1243675 A1

EP 1243675 A1 2002-09-25 - Microfiber and its manufacturing method

Title (en)

Microfiber and its manufacturing method

Title (de)

Mikrofaser und deren Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Microfibre et son procédé de production

Publication

EP 1243675 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01106451 A

Priority

EP 01106451 A

Abstract (en)

This super micro-fiber is mainly prepared by the materials of polyamide (component A ) and copolyester (component B ). Because these two polymers have poor affinity, a little bit of the third component ( component C ) is added thereto so as to improve their affinity. The component B is polyethylene terephthalate with the additives of straight-chained fatty di-acid or di-ol or iso-phthalic acid 5 SIMILAR 40% mol while polymerizing to decrease its melting point and melting viscosity; however, its molecular weight is appropriately maintained. The component C contains the 5-sodium sulfodimethylisophthalate 0 SIMILAR 1% mol besides the additives in the component B. Meanwhile, the melting viscosity ratio between component A and B in the operation temperature should be controlled in 4 SIMILAR 10. The melting viscosity of component C should be kept between those of component A and B. The composition of component A is 30 SIMILAR 50 % wt, component B is 40 SIMILAR 65 % wt and component C is 5 SIMILAR 10 % wt. The three components are blended with a single- or twin-screw extruder. The blended polymer which has the structure of polyamide( island )/polyester(sea) is spun with spinneret pack pressure 70 SIMILAR 130 kg/cm<2> and taking up velocity 600 SIMILAR 1500 m/min. The spun fiber can be drawn furthermore. The copolyester will be removed by dissolving the fiber in alkaline solution and the remained is the polyamide super micro-fiber of 0.0003 SIMILAR 0.003 dpf. This manufacturing method can be applied in the production of artificial leather with meticulous feeling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/60; D01F 6/90; D01F 6/92; D01F 8/12; D01F 8/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/60 (2006.01); D01F 6/90 (2006.01); D01F 6/92 (2006.01); D01F 8/12 (2006.01); D01F 8/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 8/12 (2013.01); D01F 6/60 (2013.01); D01F 6/90 (2013.01); D01F 6/92 (2013.01); D01F 8/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 1432228 A 19760414 - ASAHI CHEMICAL IND
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198131, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A23, AN 1981-56235D, XP002176323
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199305, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A23, AN 1993-042835, XP002176324

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243675 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050110

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI