Global Patent Index - EP 1243688 A1

EP 1243688 A1 2002-09-25 - Use of chitosan nanoparticles

Title (en)

Use of chitosan nanoparticles

Title (de)

Verwendung von Chitosan-Nanopartikeln

Title (fr)

Utilisation de nanoparticules de chitosane

Publication

EP 1243688 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01107163 A

Priority

EP 01107163 A

Abstract (en)

Nanochitosans (I) are used in the production of fibers, yarns, fabrics and textile sheets. (I) are nanoparticles of chitosan. <??>An Independent claim is included for fibers, yarns, fabrics and textile sheets containing (I).

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird die Verwendung von Nanochitosanen zur Herstellung von Fasern, Garnen, Gewirken und textilen Flächengebilden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 15/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/03 (2006.01); D06M 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/03 (2013.01); D06M 23/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 0047177 A1 20000817 - COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199715, Derwent World Patents Index; Class B07, AN 1997-161406, XP002158841
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199711, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A18, AN 1997-115286, XP002177356
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 05 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243688 A1 20020925; WO 02077358 A1 20021003

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030923

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010322

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI