Global Patent Index - EP 1243690 A1

EP 1243690 A1 2002-09-25 - Process for the antimicrobial finishing of fibres or nonwovens

Title (en)

Process for the antimicrobial finishing of fibres or nonwovens

Title (de)

Verfahren zur antimikrobiellen Ausrüstung von Fasern oder Vliesstoffen

Title (fr)

Procédé d'apprêt antimicrobien de fibres ou non-tissés

Publication

EP 1243690 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01107166 A

Priority

EP 01107166 A

Abstract (en)

Antimicrobial finishing of fibers or non-wovens involves applying an aqueous preparation containing millicapsules (A) of average diameter 0.1-5 mm, obtained by: (a) forming an aqueous or organic matrix from an active agent (I) and a wax (II) (both insoluble in the matrix) above the m.pt. of (II); (b) cooling to below the m.pt. of (II); and (c) filtering off (A). <??>Independent claims are included for: <??>(i) antimicrobially finished fibers of polyolefin or polyester, or non-wovens consisting mainly of such fibers, obtained by the above process; and <??>(ii) the use of (A), obtained as above, in the antimicrobial finishing of fibers or non-wovens formed mainly or entirely of polyolefin or polyester.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird ein Verfahren zur antimikrobiellen Ausrüstung von Fasern oder Vliesstoffen, welches sich dadurch auszeichnet, dass man diese mit wässrigen Zubereitungen von Millikapseln mit mittleren Durchmessern im Bereich von 0,1 bis 5 mm behandelt, welche erhältlich sind, indem man (a) aus Wachskörpern und Wirkstoffen oberhalb der Schmelztemperatur der Wachskörper eine wässrige oder organische Matrix herstellt, in denen diese unlöslich sind, (b) die Matrix unter die Schmelztemperatur der Wachskörper abkühlt, und (c) die entstandenen Millikapseln abfiltriert.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 16/00; D06M 23/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 16/00 (2006.01); D06M 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 23/12 (2013.01); D06M 16/00 (2013.01); D06M 2101/20 (2013.01); D06M 2101/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0539025 A2 19930428 - UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 01 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31)
  • [Y] ASAJI KONDO: "Microcapsule Processing and Technology", MARCEL DEKKER, NEW YORK (US), 1979, XP002175964

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243690 A1 20020925; WO 02077360 A1 20021003

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010322

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI