Global Patent Index - EP 1243698 A1

EP 1243698 A1 2002-09-25 - Road bed structure

Title (en)

Road bed structure

Title (de)

Strassenunterbaustruktur

Title (fr)

Structure d'assise de chaussée

Publication

EP 1243698 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02076121 A

Priority

BE 200100185 A

Abstract (en)

Road bed structure of the type which consists of a foundation (2), provided on a soil track (1), and a laying bed (4) for small-scaled elements (5), characterized in that between the upper side of the foundation (2), which is arranged with an inclination, and the laying bed (4), means are provided which guarantee for the draining of water which seeps between the joints of the small-scaled elements (5) towards the foundation (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243698 A1 20020925; BE 1014060 A3 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050201

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030219

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI