Global Patent Index - EP 1243701 A2

EP 1243701 A2 2002-09-25 - Device for ground anchoring of stay wires

Title (en)

Device for ground anchoring of stay wires

Title (de)

Erdverankerungseinrichtung für Spannseile

Title (fr)

Ancrage de sol pour haubans

Publication

EP 1243701 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02004691 A

Priority

SE 0100962 A

Abstract (en)

A device for ground anchoring of stay wires, for example anchoring of steel wires used in connection with power pylons, which are attachable to a substantially eyeshaped member (7) arranged adjacent to an end portion of a support member, which is joined to an anchoring element dug down below a ground surface. According to the invention, the support member (2) is also arranged having an eyeshaped member (8) adjacent to the end portion intended to be located below a ground surface, co-acting with and attachable to a substantially washer shaped lock means (10) having an area exceeding the cross-sectional area of a through hole or groove taken up in an anchoring element through which the support member (2) is intended to extend and be attached. The lock means (10) is advantageously arranged with a groove shaped part open in one direction, having a width facilitating insertion of the support member (2) but which is smaller than the external dimensions of the eyeshaped member (8). Furthermore, the lock means includes advantageously a substantially L-shaped member (12), arranged having a free part extending over at least a portion of the groove shaped part in a substantially parallel relationship to the lock means (10) and in direction towards the open end portion of the groove shaped part, said free end portion being arranged having a width and a distance from the lock means (10) facilitating that same is inserted into the through hole of the eyeshaped member (8), and that a portion extending out from said hole is bent over towards or away from the lock means (10), thereby locking together the eyeshaped member (8) and the lock means (10) to an internally joined condition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI GB IE SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243701 A2 20020925; EP 1243701 A3 20030402; NO 20020897 A 20020919; NO 20020897 D0 20020225; SE 0100962 D0 20010318; SE 0100962 L 20020919; SE 523533 C2 20040427

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031003

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FI GB IE SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI