Global Patent Index - EP 1243707 A2

EP 1243707 A2 2002-09-25 - Hand shower

Title (en)

Hand shower

Title (de)

Handbrause

Title (fr)

Douche à main

Publication

EP 1243707 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02001781 A

Priority

DE 10113922 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a tubular shower head (1) with water jet nozzles (11) opening into its outer jacket. This is formed mainly by an outer tube of non-flexible material. It has a window-like longitudinal opening, which is filled by a tubular shower base (6) of rubber or soft plastic with water jet nozzles. A tubular hand grip (2) is fastened to, esp. formed integrally with, the outer tube, and tube and grip enclose an obtuse angle of 120 -175 degrees .

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Handbrause mit einem Wasserstrahldüsen (11) aufweisenden rohrförmigen Brausekopf (1), in dessen zylindrischen Außenmantel die Wasserstrahldüsen (11) münden. Der Außenmantel ist zu einem größeren Bereich von einem Außenrohr (3) aus unflexiblem Material gebildet, das eine fensterförmige Längsausnehmung (3a) aufweist, die von dem die Wasserstrahldüsen (11) aufweisenden Brauseboden (6) aus Weichkunststoff oder Gummi ausgefüllt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04; B05B 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/18 (2006.01); B05B 15/02 (2006.01); E03C 1/04 (2006.01); B05B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/0404 (2013.01); B05B 1/185 (2013.01); B05B 15/528 (2018.02); B05B 1/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243707 A2 20020925; EP 1243707 A3 20021211; EP 1243707 B1 20050316; AT 291128 T 20050415; DE 10113922 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160125

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50202455

2015-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50202455

- Representative's name: TARVENKORN & WICKORD PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090125

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090125

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051219

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060125

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202455 P 20050421

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030514

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI