Global Patent Index - EP 1243710 A1

EP 1243710 A1 2002-09-25 - A method and mounting assembly for mounting a toilet to a floor

Title (en)

A method and mounting assembly for mounting a toilet to a floor

Title (de)

Montageverfahren und Befestigungsvorrichtung zur Montage einer Toilette auf dem Boden

Title (fr)

Procédé de montage et ensamble pour fixer une cuvette hygiénique au sol

Publication

EP 1243710 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02006109 A

Priority

SE 0100961 A

Abstract (en)

A method for mounting a toilet (2) or the like to a floor (3) by means of a floor attachment (1) fastened to the floor by means of screws (5) comprises the steps of a) attaching stud screws (5) to a subfloor (6), b) providing the subfloor with a waterproofing layer (7) sealing against the stud screws, c) laying a flooring (8) above the waterproofing layer, and d) fastening the floor attachment (1) to the stud screws above the flooring by means of nuts (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243710 A1 20020925; NO 20021344 A 20020923; NO 20021344 D0 20020318; SE 0100961 D0 20010320; SE 0100961 L 20020921; SE 518843 C2 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080222

2007-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071011

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030315

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI