Global Patent Index - EP 1243714 A1

EP 1243714 A1 2002-09-25 - Building block

Title (en)

Building block

Title (de)

Baublock

Title (fr)

Bloc pour la construction d'un mur de bâtiment

Publication

EP 1243714 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290689 A

Priority

FR 0103685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2822175A1] The construction block consists of a parallelepiped core (2) of an insulating material, covered on one face (7) with an outer panel (3), and on the other (8) with an inner panel (4). The core also has at least one vertical channel (10) that is filled with concrete to form a post, and a series of peripheral channels (11, 12, 21) that are linked to the vertical channel(s) and also filled with concrete when the posts are being formed, creating a sealed barrier to prevent water penetration. The core also has horizontal (15) and vertical (16) drainage grooves to shed any water penetrating the outer layer.

Abstract (fr)

Bloc pour la construction d'un mur de bâtiment comportant une âme (2) sensiblement parallélépipédique en un matériau isolant, recouverte, sur une face (7), d'une planelle extérieure (3) en un matériau de parement. Cette âme comporte deux faces latérales (9) et est traversée par au moins un conduit vertical (10) s'étendant sensiblement parallèlement aux faces latérales (9) et étant destiné à être rempli de béton, pour former un potelet. L'âme comporte en outre des gorges périphériques (11,12,21) qui communiquent avec le conduit vertical et qui se remplissent de béton lors du coulage des potelets du mur en formant une barrière étanche empêchant la pénétration d'eau dans le mur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243714 A1 20020925; FR 2822175 A1 20020920; FR 2822175 B1 20040820

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070625

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030321

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOMOCLEST BATIMENT

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI