Global Patent Index - EP 1243721 A2

EP 1243721 A2 2002-09-25 - Floor covering, panel and panel fastening system

Title (en)

Floor covering, panel and panel fastening system

Title (de)

Fussbodenbelag, Paneel sowie Befestigungssystem für Paneele

Title (fr)

Revêtement de sol, panneau et dispositif de fixation pour panneaux

Publication

EP 1243721 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02014295 A

Priority

  • DE 19929896 A
  • DE 29911462 U
  • EP 99957872 A

Abstract (en)

The mating holding profiles (4a,4b) hook together via elements (4c,4d) whose holding faces (5h) close the panels (4,6) together to give gap-free flooring. The hook element of the leading holding profile of one panel forms a crosspiece (4e) projecting at right angles from the narrow element side so as to lie on the top surface of the panel and a hook projecting from the free end of the crosspiece towards the underside of the panel as against the trailing holding profile of a panel which has a hook to reach out from the narrow side and form a crosspiece bearing on the underside of the panel. A hook projection from the free end of the crosspiece points towards the top side of the panel. Joined panels form a glue pocket between (12).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Befestigungssystem für Paneele (2, 3) mit an den Schmalseiten der Paneele (2, 3) angeordneten Halteprofilen, insbesondere für Fußbodenpaneele, wobei sich gegenüberliegende Halteprofile als komplementäre Formschlussprofile (4, 5) ausgebildet sind, dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass durch die Formschlussprofile (4, 5) eine gelenkige und nachgiebige Verbindung der Paneele (2, 3) ermöglicht ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27F 1/04 (2006.01); E04F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02 (2013.01); B27F 1/04 (2013.01); E04F 15/04 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0115 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0138 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0146 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0153 (2013.01); E04F 2201/023 (2013.01); E04F 2201/025 (2013.01); E04F 2201/07 (2013.01); Y10T 403/65 (2013.01); Y10T 403/655 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243721 A2 20020925; EP 1243721 A3 20030709; AT 222634 T 20020915; AT 277246 T 20041015; AU 1546600 A 20010122; AU 1546800 A 20010122; CA 2377799 A1 20010111; CA 2377799 C 20051129; CA 2377919 A1 20010111; CA 2377919 C 20051004; EP 1165906 A1 20020102; EP 1165906 B1 20020821; EP 1190149 A1 20020327; EP 1190149 B1 20040121; EP 2116666 A1 20091111; EP 2116666 B1 20180328; EP 2312087 A2 20110420; EP 2312087 A3 20110427; EP 2312087 B1 20180328; ES 2182582 T3 20030301; ES 2228133 T3 20050401; PT 1190149 E 20050131; RU 2224070 C2 20040220; US 6505452 B1 20030114; US 7896571 B1 20110301; WO 0102669 A1 20010111; WO 0102670 A1 20010111

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20140621

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050406

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1165906

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI