Global Patent Index - EP 1243724 A2

EP 1243724 A2 2002-09-25 - Outer door handle for vehicles

Title (en)

Outer door handle for vehicles

Title (de)

Türaussengriff für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Poignée exterieure pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1243724 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003947 A

Priority

DE 10114583 A

Abstract (en)

The device acts on a lock via a connecting element and has a normally inoperative crash lock and a crash sensor responsive to inertial force that activates the crash lock in a crash. The crash lock blocks the connecting element and does not transfer an inertial force on the handle to the lock. The connecting element has a drive element that moves in a liquid medium whose viscosity varies depending on an electric field controlled by the sensor. The device acts on a lock via a connecting element (31) when operated and has a crash lock (30) for the connecting element that is normally inoperative and a crash sensor responsive to inertial force that activates the crash lock in the event of a crash. The crash lock blocks the connecting element and does not transfer an inertial actuation force on the handle to the lock. The connecting element has a drive element (32) that moves with it in a liquid medium (40) whose viscosity varies depending on an applied electric field controlled by the crash sensor.

Abstract (de)

Ein Türaußengriff wirkt über ein Verbindungsglied auf ein Schloss. Dort greift eine Crashsperre (30) an, die normalerweise unwirksam ist. Sie wird aber von einem Crashsensor im Crashfall wirksam gesetzt und blockiert das Verbindungsglied (31) Dann werden im Betätigungssinne auf den Griff wirkende Trägheitskräfte nicht auf das Schloss übertragen. Um einen leichtgängigen, zuverlässigen Türaußengriff zu erreichen, wird vorgeschlagen, das Verbindungsglied (31) mit einem mitbeweglichen Mitnehmer (32) auszurüsten und diesen in einem besonderen flüssigen Medium (40) anzuordnen. Dieses Medium (40) hat die Eigenschaft, dass seine Viskosität unter den Einfluss eines elektrischen Feldes sich wesentlich verändert. Es wird daher vorgeschlagen, dass der Crashsensor das im Medium herrschende elektrische Feld steuert und dadurch die Viskosität so verändert, dass das Verbindungsglied (31) als Crashsperre (30) wirkt, (Fig. 2). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/06 (2014.01); E05B 77/42 (2014.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 85/18 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/06 (2013.01); E05B 77/42 (2013.01); E05B 85/18 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0033 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10S 292/65 (2013.01); Y10T 16/458 (2013.01); Y10T 292/57 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243724 A2 20020925; EP 1243724 A3 20031217; EP 1243724 B1 20041027; DE 10114583 C1 20021205; ES 2225666 T3 20050316; US 2002148075 A1 20021017; US 6712409 B2 20040330

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-27 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50201376

- Effective date: 20140116

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110223

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110222

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110222

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110222

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-06-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225666 T3

2005-03-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050214

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201376 P 20041202

2004-12-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-10-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOENIG, STEFAN

2004-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031212

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 7/00 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/20 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 51/02 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 17/20 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/12 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI