Global Patent Index - EP 1243725 A2

EP 1243725 A2 2002-09-25 - Locking device for assisted final closing of the wing

Title (en)

Locking device for assisted final closing of the wing

Title (de)

Schliesseinrichtung mit Zuziehhilfe

Title (fr)

Serrure à fermeture assistée

Publication

EP 1243725 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006062 A

Priority

DE 10114438 A

Abstract (en)

The closure device has a pull-to aid that drives a drive element (30). A decoupling element (32) mounted on the drive element or on a rotary catch (12) can be moved with the aid of a decoupling and opening mechanism (42,50) from a position in which the drive element engages the rotary catch into a disengaged position in which the rotary catch is released.

Abstract (de)

Eine Schließeinrichtung (10), insbesondere für Fahrzeugtüren, besitzt eine mit einem Schließzapfen oder Schließbügel zusammenwirkende Drehfalle (12), eine lösbare Sperrklinke (18) zum Arretieren der Tür und eine motorisch angetriebene Zuziehhilfe, welche die Tür in die Schließstellung bewegt. Aus Sicherheitsaspekten problematisch ist eine Aktivierung der Zuziehhilfe, wenn sich zwischen der Tür und der Karosserie noch Finger oder Gegenstände befinden. Um die Verletzungs- bzw. Beschädigungsgefahr zu vermindern, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Zuziehhilfe ein Mitnehmerelement (30) antreibt und an diesem oder der Drehfalle (12) ein Entkopplungselement (32) beweglich gelagert ist, das mit Hilfe des Entkoppel- und Öffnungsmechanismus (42, 50) aus einer die Mitnahme zwischen dem Mitnehmerelement (30) und der Drehfalle (12) bewirkende Stellung in eine ausgerückte Stellung bewegbar ist. Durch diese Maßnahme wird die Drehfalle (12) sofort freigegeben und die Tür springt auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/20 (2014.01); E05B 81/90 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/21 (2013.01); E05B 81/90 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243725 A2 20020925; EP 1243725 A3 20031217; EP 1243725 B1 20060607; DE 10114438 A1 20021002; DE 50207052 D1 20060720

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2012-04-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120309

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-05-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070521

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207052 P 20060720

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050603

2004-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/32 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/00 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/12 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI