Global Patent Index - EP 1243729 A2

EP 1243729 A2 2002-09-25 - Drive-bar actuated locking device for a window, a door or similar

Title (en)

Drive-bar actuated locking device for a window, a door or similar

Title (de)

Schubstangenbetätigbarer Verschluss für Fenster, Türen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage à tige d'actionnement pour une fenêtre, une porte ou similaire

Publication

EP 1243729 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450066 A

Priority

AT 4432001 A

Abstract (en)

The bolt housing (1) contains a connecting rod (4) longitudinally moved by the thrust rod (3) and possessing a slanting slot (5) in relation to its direction of movement. A pin (6) fitting into the slot slides out, or pulls back a catch into or out of a closure piece. The catch consists of two expander tongues (7,8) linked to the pin and slid into and out of the bolt housing. The two expander tongues touch guides for the expander movement and have hooked ends.

Abstract (de)

Ein schubstangenbetätigbarer Verschluss für Fenster, Türen oder dergleichen verfügt über ein Winkelgetriebe in einem Riegelgehäuse (1). Dazu ist eine Kulisse (4) an der Schubstange (3) mit einem schrägliegenden Schlitz (5) und ein in diesen eingreifender Zapfen (6) vorgesehen. Auf dem Zapfen (6) sind zwei Spreizzungen (7, 8; 7', 8') schwenkbar gelagert, die bei Betätigung des Zapfen (6)-Schlitz (5)-Getriebes riegelartig aus dem Riegelgehäuse (1) ausschiebbar sind. An beiden Spreizzungen (7, 8; 7', 8') greifen Führungen für eine Spreizbewegung am Ende des Ausschiebens an. Die gespreizten Spreizzungen (7, 8; 7', 8') hintergreifen Hinterschneidungen an einem Schließstück (9). Zur Spreizführung können Mitnehmer (20, 21) an den Spreizzungen (7, 8; 7', 8') in Führungsschlitze (18, 19) in der Schlossplatte oder Schlossdecke greifen. Die Seitenkanten der Spreizzungen (7, 8; 7', 8') können auch in schräge Einschnitte (14, 15) übergehen, in die Einlaufflächen (16, 17) hineinführen. Die Einlaufflächen (16, 17) laufen gegen gehäusefeste Bolzen (12, 13) an und bewirken bei weiterem Vorschub eine Spreizung der Spreizzungen (7, 8; 7', 8'). (Fig. 2) <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18; E05B 63/12; E05C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 63/12 (2006.01); E05C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/30 (2013.01); E05C 9/1875 (2013.01); E05B 63/12 (2013.01); E05C 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243729 A2 20020925; EP 1243729 A3 20040121; EP 1243729 B1 20060614; AT 500183 A2 20051115; AT 500183 A3 20060915; AT 500183 B1 20070115; DE 50207152 D1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130320

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130320

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50207152

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130320

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120413

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060923

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207152 P 20060727

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-06-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2004-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AG

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI