Global Patent Index - EP 1243734 A1

EP 1243734 A1 2002-09-25 - GLASS CARRIER IN A CABLE-ACTUATED WINDOW REGULATOR

Title (en)

GLASS CARRIER IN A CABLE-ACTUATED WINDOW REGULATOR

Title (de)

Scheibenmitnehmer für einen Seilfensterheber

Title (fr)

Curseur de lève-vitre à câble

Publication

EP 1243734 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290704 A

Priority

FR 0103811 A

Abstract (en)

The window raiser cursor (6) which has a reception groove for a cursor guide has a metallic structure (10), a plastic part (11) forming the groove and a stop aided by a spring housed in a notch for assembling the plastic part onto the metallic structure.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un curseur (6) de lève-vitre avec une rainure (15) de réception d'un guide (2) de curseur, présentant une structure métallique (10), une pièce en matière plastique (11) formant la rainure (15) et des moyens d'assemblage à froid (21, 22) de la pièce en matière plastique sur la structure métallique. Le curseur de l'invention est solide, glisse avec un frottement réduit sur un rail de lève-vitre et son assemblage est facile. L'invention concerne également un lève-vitre présentant un tel curseur. L'invention concerne par ailleurs un procédé de fabrication d'un curseur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/48; E05F 11/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/38 (2006.01); E05F 11/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/385 (2013.01); E05F 11/486 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/502 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243734 A1 20020925; EP 1243734 B1 20070117; DE 60217567 D1 20070308; FR 2822493 A1 20020927; FR 2822493 B1 20041112

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070309

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070418

2007-12-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071018

2007-04-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070428

2007-03-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60217567 P 20070308

2007-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050420

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI