Global Patent Index - EP 1243737 A2

EP 1243737 A2 2002-09-25 - Fixing device for a casing frame in a wall opening

Title (en)

Fixing device for a casing frame in a wall opening

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Zargenrahmens in einer Wandöffnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un dormant dans une ouverture murale

Publication

EP 1243737 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004058 A

Priority

DE 20104856 U

Abstract (en)

The device is for fixing a frame in a wall aperture, where the frame (2) comprises a door frame (5) and a second corresponding, completing counter frame (6), with fixture points (7) in the door frame pointing to the opening edge of the light structure wall. In the fixture points, a rotary penetrating anchor formed as a tab (8) is fixable. The tab and the fixture point work in conjunction with one another via a bayonet-type closure. The fixture point itself is pot-shaped, with an elongated aperture running in its base, through which hook components (12.1) (12.2) formed on or stamped out of the tab are insertable. The hook components, as the result of the pivoting of the tab, engage behind the lateral remaining base areas of the pot.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Zargenrahmens in einer Wandöffnung, wobei der Zargenrahmen (2) aus einer Türzarge (5) und einer zweiten zur Komplettierung des Zargenrahmen (2) korrespondierenden Gegenzarge (6) besteht, wobei in der Türzarge (5) zur Öffnungskante der Montage- oder Leichtbauwand (4) weisend Befestigungspunkte (7) angeordnet sind. in die ein als Lasche (8) ausgebildete Eindrehanker fixierbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/6015 (2013.01); E06B 1/6023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20104856 U1 20020502; EP 1243737 A2 20020925; EP 1243737 A3 20031112; PL 352893 A1 20020923

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040513

2004-09-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI