Global Patent Index - EP 1243738 A3

EP 1243738 A3 2002-11-20 - Compound wood-aluminium window

Title (en)

Compound wood-aluminium window

Title (de)

Holz-Alu-Fenster

Title (fr)

Fenêtre mixte bois-aluminium

Publication

EP 1243738 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01119205 A

Priority

DE 10114233 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1243738A2] A wood-aluminum window consists of an external aluminum shell with T-shaped holders that locate into a C-shaped section of reinforcing and holding ribs. The T-shaped holder is formed by a holding rail (6) with elastic wings (8) that locate behind angled slats (9). The holding rail consists of polyvinyl chloride (PVC) and the frame seal consists of APDK.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/26 (2013.01); E06B 3/302 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243738 A2 20020925; EP 1243738 A3 20021120; DE 10114233 A1 20021002; DE 10114233 B4 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HERMANN GUTMANN WERKE AG

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI