Global Patent Index - EP 1243740 A2

EP 1243740 A2 2002-09-25 - Joint between a hollow mullion profile and a frame or transom profile

Title (en)

Joint between a hollow mullion profile and a frame or transom profile

Title (de)

Stossverbindung eines Kämpferhohlprofils mit einem Rahmen- oder Sprossenprofil

Title (fr)

Raccord entre un profilé de meneau creux et un profilé d'encadrement ou de croisillon

Publication

EP 1243740 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01130609 A

Priority

DE 10114083 A

Abstract (en)

A connecting piece (25) fits into a chamber (12) of the hollow profiled transom (11) and is axially fixed . The connecting-piece has parallel hooked strips (31,32) fixed into parallel back-tapered lengthwise grooves (16,17) in the frame piece (13). A slide piece (27) on the connecting piece has the parallel hooked strips and which is contained in a groove in a finger (26) of the connecting piece and fixed in the transom's chamber so that the slide piece is spring-loaded to move along. The slide piece and finger interlock and are relatively adjustably movable in the direction of the groove's depth.

Abstract (de)

Eine Stoßverbindung (10) eines Kämpferhohlprofils (11) mit einem Rahmen- bzw. Sprossenprofil (13) ist mit einem Wesentlichen spielfrei passend in eine Kammer (12) des Kämpferhohlprofils (11) einschiebbaren und dort axial fixierbaren Verbindungsstück (25) versehen, dass mit parallelen Hakenleisten (31, 32) in parallelen hinterschnittenen Längsnuten (16, 17) des Rahmen- oder Sprossenprofils (13) festlegbar ist. Um in einfacherer Weise eine genaue Bündigkeit der aneinanderliegenden Profile (13, 11) zu erreichen und ohne Weiteres eine nachträgliche Justierung des Kämpferhohlprofils (11) am Rahmen- oder Sprossenprofil (13) zuzulassen, ist vorgesehen, dass das Verbindungsstück (25) einen die parallelen Hakenleisten (31, 32) aufweisenden Schieber (27) besitzt, der in einer Nut (28) eines in der Kammer (12) des Kämpferhohlprofils (11) fixierbaren Fingers (26) des Verbindungsstücks (25) federbelastet längsbewegbar aufgenommen ist und dass der Schieber (27) und der Finger (26), deren einander gegenüberliegende Seiten mittels Keilflächen (38, 39) ineinandergreifen, in Richtung der Tiefe der Nut (28) durch eine Verstellung senkrecht hierzu relativ zueinander einstellbar bewegbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/964

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/964 (2006.01); E06B 3/972 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/9642 (2013.01); E06B 3/972 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4108547 C1 19920617

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243740 A2 20020925; EP 1243740 A3 20030604; DE 10114083 C1 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 3/964 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 3/96 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI