Global Patent Index - EP 1243744 A1

EP 1243744 A1 2002-09-25 - Venetian blind drawn upwardly

Title (en)

Venetian blind drawn upwardly

Title (de)

Jalousie mit Laufrichtung von unten nach oben

Title (fr)

Jalousie avec course ascendante

Publication

EP 1243744 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01106828 A

Priority

EP 01106828 A

Abstract (en)

The horizontal slats (1) forming the blind are contained in a box-shaped housing (12) integrated in a seat beneath the window and possessing a lid over its top opening. The blind is inserted into, and removed from, the housing by a preferably electric motor driving at least one toothed belt (3) tensioned by a pressure roller. The ends of the belt are joined by a connector (5) to form a loop in contact with a bar (7) at the top of the blind.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Jalousie zur Anbringung an einem Fenster, einer Tür o. dgl. mit im wesentlichen horizontal verlaufenden, einen Behang bildenden Lamellen, wobei der Behang in einer Laufrichtung vor das Fenster, die Tür o. dgl. in eine Wirkposition verbringbar ist. Um eine Jalousie zu schaffen, die einfacher einzubauen, zu warten und zu reparieren ist und die auch dann eingesetzt werden kann, wenn oberhalb eines Fensters, einer Tür o. dgl. nicht ausreichend Raum zur Verfügung steht, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, dass sich die Laufrichtung von unten nach oben erstreckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/66; E06B 9/388

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/388 (2006.01); E06B 9/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/66 (2013.01); E06B 9/388 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243744 A1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070820

2007-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070207

2006-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DINILUX GMBH

2006-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NIEMANN, DIETER

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI LU NL

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010319

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI