Global Patent Index - EP 1243781 A3

EP 1243781 A3 2003-06-04 - Cover with sandwich construction and seal

Title (en)

Cover with sandwich construction and seal

Title (de)

Sandwichdeckel mit Dichtung

Title (fr)

Couvercle en sandwich avec élément d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 1243781 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02002606 A

Priority

DE 10113175 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1243781A2] The cover (1) consists of an esp. sheet metal layer (4), with static vulcanized seal (2) in the cover flange (9). It is formed as a heat shield so that the seal is protected against overheating due to external heat radiation. The cover consists of two sheet metal plates (4,5), positioned above each other, with a toothed plate (3) between them. The teeth are pressed into the metal plates to different depths, so that the toothed plate acts as spacer. There may also be an insulation layer between the metal plates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 77/11 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 77/11 (2013.01); F02F 7/006 (2013.01); F02F 11/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243781 A2 20020925; EP 1243781 A3 20030604; EP 1243781 B1 20070103; DE 10113175 A1 20020926; DE 10113175 C2 20030918; DE 50209119 D1 20070215

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090205

2010-12-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100726

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090205

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090205

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ELRING KLINGER AG

- Effective date: 20070927

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209119 P 20070215

2007-01-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI