Global Patent Index - EP 1243785 A2

EP 1243785 A2 2002-09-25 - Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de carburant pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1243785 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004727 A

Priority

DE 10113654 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a fuel pump (10) for each cylinder, fuel injection valves (12), and electric control valves (60). A first control valve is located close to the fuel pump, a second control valve (64) is positioned close to the fuel injection valve, and is operated by the pressure in the control pressure chamber (52) of the injection valve, which charges the valve member (28) in closing direction. The second control valve controls a connection (56) between the control pressure chamber and the pump working chamber (22).

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist eine Kraftstoffpumpe (10) für jeden Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine auf, die einen durch die Brennkraftmaschine in einer Hubbewegung angetriebenen Pumpenkolben (18) aufweist, der einen Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) begrenzt, welcher über eine Leitung (14) mit einem getrennt von der Kraftstoffpumpe (10) an der Brennkraftmaschine angeordneten Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) verbunden ist, das ein Einspritzventilglied (28) aufweist, durch das wenigstens eine Einspritzöffnung (32) gesteuert wird und das durch den im Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) erzeugten Druck gegen eine Schließkraft in Öffnungsrichtung (29) bewegbar ist, wobei ein erstes elektrisch angesteuertes Steuerventil (60) vorgesehen ist, durch das eine Verbindung (59) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) mit einem Entlastungsraum (24) gesteuert wird und das nahe der Kraftstoffpumpe (10) angeordnet ist. Ein zweites elektrisch angesteuertes Steuerventil (64) ist vorgesehen, das nahe dem Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) angeordnet ist und durch das der in einem Steuerdruckraum (52) des Kraftstoffeinspritzventils (12) herrschende Druck gesteuert wird, durch den das Einspritzventilglied (28) zumindest mittelbar in Schließrichtung beaufschlagt ist. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 45/04; F02M 45/02; F02M 47/02; F02M 57/02; F02M 59/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/02 (2006.01); F02M 45/04 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/366 (2013.01); F02M 45/02 (2013.01); F02M 45/04 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 61/205 (2013.01); F02M 2200/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243785 A2 20020925; EP 1243785 A3 20040128; DE 10113654 A1 20020926; US 2002134359 A1 20020926; US 6659086 B2 20031209

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051122

2005-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/04 A

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 57/02 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/36 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/02 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI