Global Patent Index - EP 1243795 A1

EP 1243795 A1 2002-09-25 - A two-stage vacuum pump

Title (en)

A two-stage vacuum pump

Title (de)

Zweistufige Vakuumpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à vide à deux étages

Publication

EP 1243795 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02356050 A

Priority

FR 0103678 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002131870A1] In a vacuum pumping system according to the invention, the Roots or claw multistage dry primary pump discharges into an outlet stage including an additional piston or membrane pump connected in parallel with a preliminary evacuation pipe including a check valve. The outlet stage very significantly reduces heating of the primary pump and thereby enables the vacuum pumping system to pump efficiently and without damage gases with a low thermal conductivity, such as argon or xenon.

Abstract (fr)

Dans un système de pompage à vide selon l'invention, la pompe primaire sèche multi-étagée de type Roots ou claw refoule dans un étage de sortie comprenant une pompe additionnelle (6) à pistons ou à membranes raccordée en parallèle avec une canalisation de prévidage (7) munie d'un clapet anti-retour (11). L'étage de sortie réduit très sensiblement l'échauffement de la pompe primaire (1), et permet ainsi au système de pompage à vide de pomper efficacement et sans dommages des gaz à faible conductivité thermique tels que l'argon ou le xénon. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 23/00; F04B 23/08; F04B 45/04; F04C 18/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 37/14 (2006.01); F04B 37/16 (2006.01); F04B 41/06 (2006.01); F04B 45/04 (2006.01); F04C 23/00 (2006.01); F04C 25/02 (2006.01); F04C 29/12 (2006.01); F04C 18/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 41/06 (2013.01); F04B 37/14 (2013.01); F04B 45/04 (2013.01); F04C 23/001 (2013.01); F04C 23/005 (2013.01); F04C 25/02 (2013.01); F04C 18/123 (2013.01); F04C 18/126 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243795 A1 20020925; EP 1243795 B1 20040519; AT 267345 T 20040615; DE 60200493 D1 20040624; DE 60200493 T2 20050804; FR 2822200 A1 20020920; FR 2822200 B1 20030926; JP 2002339864 A 20021127; JP 4166491 B2 20081015; US 2002131870 A1 20020919; US 6644931 B2 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170403

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60200493

2016-10-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PFEIFFER VACUUM, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ADIXEN VACUUM PRODUCTS, ANNECY, FR

- Document: DE 60200493

2016-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60200493

- Representative's name: FDST PATENTANWAELTE FREIER DOERR STAMMLER TSCH, DE

2016-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60200493

2016-09-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ADIXEN VACUUM PRODUCTS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALCATEL LUCENT, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60200493

2016-09-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PFEIFFER VACUUM, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALCATEL LUCENT, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60200493

2016-09-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60200493

- Representative's name: FDST PATENTANWAELTE FREIER DOERR STAMMLER TSCH, DE

2016-09-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60200493

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: PFEIFFER VACCUUM, FR

- Effective date: 20160118

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130313

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130313

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130313

2013-11-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ADIXEN VACUUM PRODUCTS, FR

- Effective date: 20131009

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041019

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALCATEL

- Effective date: 20050331

2007-08-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALCATEL

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050313

2005-03-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040830

2004-08-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-08-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-08-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040720

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200493 P 20040624

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI