Global Patent Index - EP 1243796 A2

EP 1243796 A2 2002-09-25 - Vacuum pump

Title (en)

Vacuum pump

Title (de)

Vakuumpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à vide

Publication

EP 1243796 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005166 A

Priority

DE 10114585 A

Abstract (en)

The pump consists of two single/multistage gas friction pumps (6,7) and a multistage pump (8). The gas friction pumps are positioned parallel in direction of flow, so that the intake gas flow is divided into two part flows in the suction area (22). Each part flow is conveyed by the associated friction pump from the suction area to the ejection areas (23,24). The two part flows are subsequently united via connection elements (26) in an ejection chamber (25). This chamber is connected to the suction chamber (27) of the third pump via pipes (28), so that this pump further compresses the gas.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt eine Vakuumpumpe, welche aus einer zweiflutigen Gasreibungspumpe (6) und (7) und aus einer nachgeschalteten Pumpe (9) besteht. Die Gasströme der zweiflutigen Gasreibungspumpe werden innerhalb der Pumpe durch Verbindungselemente (26) zusammengeführt und durch die nachfolgende Pumpe (9) auf Atmosphärendruck verdichtet. Die Gasreibungspumpe ist vorteilhafterweise als zweiflutige Holweckpumpe und die nachgeschaltete Pumpe als Seitenkanalpumpe ausgebildet. Die kompakte Bauweise der Pumpe wird noch ergänzt durch die Tatsache, dass die Statorelemente (15) der Seitenkanalpumpe aus ungeteilten Scheiben bestehen. Diese Bauweise wird ermöglicht durch Rotorscheiben (13), welche durch Klemmringe (14) auf dem Rotor (4) befestigt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04; F04D 17/16; F04D 23/00; F04D 29/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04D 23/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/26 (2006.01); F04D 29/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/168 (2013.01); F04D 19/044 (2013.01); F04D 19/046 (2013.01); F04D 23/008 (2013.01); F04D 29/263 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243796 A2 20020925; EP 1243796 A3 20030827; EP 1243796 B1 20061108; DE 10114585 A1 20020926; DE 50208630 D1 20061221; JP 2002310092 A 20021023; US 2002136643 A1 20020926; US 6676384 B2 20040113

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50208630

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150308

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150308

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150308

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140310

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120307

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070809

2007-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070207

2006-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208630 P 20061221

2006-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI