Global Patent Index - EP 1243799 A2

EP 1243799 A2 2002-09-25 - Hydraulic system for two fixed-volume pumps

Title (en)

Hydraulic system for two fixed-volume pumps

Title (de)

Hydraulikanlage für zwei Konstantpumpen

Title (fr)

Système hydraulique pour deux pompes à débits constants

Publication

EP 1243799 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005602 A

Priority

DE 10114042 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a supply pipe (14) containing a preceding hydraulic module (27). This is positioned, so that the bypass channel (29) branches off the section (23) downstream of the module. This section is also connected to a secondary connections (40), which is charged with pressure medium by the second fixed displacement pump. The module is formed for attachment to a connection panel (16). The feed channel in the panel is interrupted in such a way, that its two sections (22,23) each form an intermediate connection (25,26) in a mounting surface (24), and are connected by the module.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Hydraulikanlage (10) vorgeschlagen, der die Druckmittelströme zweier Konstantpumpen (11, 12) mit zugeordneten Druckwaagen (31, 59) zuführbar sind. Ein unterbrochener Zulaufkanal (18) weist zwei Zwischenanschlüsse (25, 26) auf, zwischen die wahlweise ein vorschaltbares Regelventil (66) schaltbar ist, wobei der davon stromabwärts liegende Abschnitt (23) des Zulaufkanals (18) mit einem Zweitanschluß (40) für den Anschluß der zweiten Konstantpumpe (12) verbunden ist und über einen Bypasskanal (29) mit eingeschalteter erster Druckwaage (31) zum Tank (13) Verbindung hat. Die Schaltanordnung ist äußerst flexibel für Ein- und Zwei-Pumpenlösungs-Konzepte einsetzbar und erlaubt bei kaskadenförmiger Zuschaltung der Druckmittelströme und vorgeschaltetem Regelventil eine energiesparende Arbeitsweise. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/00; F15B 11/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 23/06 (2006.01); F04B 49/08 (2006.01); F15B 11/17 (2006.01); F15B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/17 (2013.01); F04B 23/06 (2013.01); F04B 49/08 (2013.01); F15B 2013/006 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20576 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30505 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30535 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3111 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40507 (2013.01); F15B 2211/46 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50536 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5157 (2013.01); F15B 2211/57 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6054 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243799 A2 20020925; EP 1243799 A3 20040317; DE 10114042 A1 20020926; DE 10114042 B4 20080410

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04B 49/00 A

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 15B 11/17 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI