Global Patent Index - EP 1243848 A2

EP 1243848 A2 2002-09-25 - Vehicle headlamp and method of fixing a lamp cover on the same

Title (en)

Vehicle headlamp and method of fixing a lamp cover on the same

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge und Verfahren zum Befestigen einer Abschlussscheibe desselben

Title (fr)

Projecteur pour véhicules et procédé de fixation de la glace de fermeture du même

Publication

EP 1243848 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005601 A

Priority

DE 10114567 A

Abstract (en)

A headlamp has a housing element (4), in which a lamp element is fitted, with an opening that is covered by a translucent locking plate. An edge piece (8) for the translucent locking plate or for the housing element fits in a groove (5) partly filled with an adhesive or sealant. An Independent claim is also included for a method for fastening a translucent locking plate on a housing element for a vehicle headlamp.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge bestehend aus einem Gehäuseelement (4), in dem ein Leuchtelement angeordnet ist, mit einer Öffnung, die durch eine lichtdurchlässige Abschlussscheibe (3) abgedeckt ist, dass ein Randsteg (8) der Abschlussscheibe (3) oder des Gehäuseelementes (4) in einer zumindest teilweise mit einem Klebe- oder Dichtmittel gefüllten Nut (5) des Gehäuseelementes (4) bzw. der Abschlussscheibe (3) angeordnet ist, wobei der Randsteg (8) ein Positionierhilfeelement (9,20) aufweist, das den Randsteg (8) in einer unveränderbaren Lage innerhalb der Nut (5) haltert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/101 (2013.01); F21S 41/29 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243848 A2 20020925; EP 1243848 A3 20050601; DE 10114567 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-08-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051202

2006-02-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-06-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI