Global Patent Index - EP 1243856 A1

EP 1243856 A1 2002-09-25 - Flue gas discharge system with coupling ring

Title (en)

Flue gas discharge system with coupling ring

Title (de)

Rauchgasabzug mit Kupplungsring

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'évacuation des gaz de fumée avec bague de couplage

Publication

EP 1243856 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02076093 A

Priority

NL 1017653 A

Abstract (en)

The invention describes a system (1), comprising a flue gas discharge pipe (20) and a moisture-discharge flange (10) for a flue gas discharge cap (50). The system (1) further comprises a coupling ring (30), which is connected on the one hand to the free upper end of the flue gas discharge pipe (20) and on the other hand to the moisture discharge flange (10). To produce a lug-and-hole connection between the coupling ring (30) and the upper end of the flue gas discharge pipe (20), the coupling ring (30) comprises connecting lugs (31), and the said end is provided with cutouts (22) for receiving the said connecting lugs (31). To produce a snap connection between the moisture discharge flange (10) and the coupling ring (30), the moisture discharge flange (10) comprises connecting lugs (14), and the coupling ring (30) is provided with cutouts (32) to receive the said connecting lugs (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 17/12; F23L 17/02; F23L 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/02 (2006.01); F23L 17/12 (2006.01); F23L 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/14 (2013.01); F23L 17/02 (2013.01); F23L 17/12 (2013.01); F23J 2213/301 (2013.01); F23J 2213/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243856 A1 20020925; NL 1017653 C2 20020923

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI