Global Patent Index - EP 1243857 A1

EP 1243857 A1 2002-09-25 - Fan for combustion air

Title (en)

Fan for combustion air

Title (de)

Gebläse für Verbrennungsluft

Title (fr)

Ventilateur pour l'air comburant

Publication

EP 1243857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02001432 A

Priority

DE 10114405 A

Abstract (en)

A method and device for adjusting the air ratio of a gaseous fuel/air mixture for operating a burner (18) comprises measuring the mass flow (7) and the Wobbe (viscosity) index of the fuel (5), measuring the mass flow of the air (13) and controlling a mass flow on the basis of these values to give the predetermined value of lambda. An Independent claim is also included for a device for the above method having flow sensors and a data unit to regulate the fuel flow though a dosing valve.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Gebläse (1) für Verbrennungsluft in einem wand/bodenstehenden Heizkessel angegeben, mit einem Gebläsegehäuse (2) und einem Gebläserad (2'), mit einem Lufteinlaß (3) (Ansaugseite) und einem Luftauslaß (4) (Druckseite) und mit einer Zuleitung (5) für ein vorzugsweise gasförmiges Verbrennungsmedium, wobei am Lufteinlaß (3) eine Sensoreinrichtung (6) zum Ermitteln des Luft-Massenstroms angeordnet ist, die mit einer elektronischen Steuer/Reglereinheit (7) funktionsverbunden ist und zu dieser Signale zur Aufbereitung des Verhältnisses Verbrennungsmedium/Verbrennungsluft in Abhängigkeit von der gewünschten Heizleistung sendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/18; F23D 14/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F23D 14/60 (2006.01); F23N 1/02 (2006.01); F23N 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/60 (2013.01); F04D 29/4213 (2013.01); F04D 29/4226 (2013.01); F23N 1/022 (2013.01); F23N 5/184 (2013.01); F23N 2005/181 (2013.01); F23N 2005/185 (2013.01); F23N 2021/10 (2013.01); F23N 2033/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243857 A1 20020925; EP 1243857 B1 20051214; CN 100464124 C 20090225; CN 1737428 A 20060222; DE 10114405 A1 20020926; DE 10114405 B4 20110324

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-11-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060130

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2005-12-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EBM-PAPST LANDSHUT GMBH

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040413

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030321

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI