Global Patent Index - EP 1243864 B1

EP 1243864 B1 2007-10-10 - Indoor unit and air-conditioner

Title (en)

Indoor unit and air-conditioner

Title (de)

Innenraumeinheit und Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Unité intérieure et conditionneur d'air

Publication

EP 1243864 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 02006380 A

Priority

  • JP 2001084413 A
  • JP 2001084414 A
  • JP 2001084415 A
  • JP 2001084416 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1243864A2] In an indoor unit, when the fan diameter of a tangential fan (14) is taken to be D, and the width of the intake diaphragm provided on the upstream side of the inlet of an air duct (40) inside the casing is taken to be f, f/D is within the range of 0.002 to 0.003 (0.002 </= f/D </= 0.003). In addition, when the width of the outlet of an air duct (40) formed between the outer peripheral surface (14a) of a tangential fan (14) and the air duct wall surface (41) of the casing is taken to be Wo, Wo/D is 0.55 or less (Wo/D </= 0.55). In addition, when a line extending in the direction of flow along the upper surface that forms the discharge port serving as the air duct outlet in the casing is taken to be a, the stabilizer tongue end angle alpha , which is formed between the surface of the stabilizer opposing tangential fan (14) and the extended line a, is within the range of 50 degrees to 60 degrees (50 degrees </= alpha </=60 degrees). In addition, when the distance between the extended line a and a tangent b of the fan diameter D parallel to said extended line a is taken to be d, d/D is within the range of -0.2 to 0.2 (-0.2 </= d/D </= 0.2). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01); F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/422 (2013.01); F04D 29/663 (2013.01); F24F 1/0011 (2013.01); F24F 1/0025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243864 A2 20020925; EP 1243864 A3 20030102; EP 1243864 B1 20071010; AT 375483 T 20071015; CN 1282853 C 20061101; CN 1376878 A 20021030; DE 60222823 D1 20071122; ES 2291387 T3 20080301

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150321

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140307

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080321

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080111

2009-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080321

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080111

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-07-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080310

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080110

2008-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2291387 T3

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60222823 P 20071122

2007-11-14 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-11-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUZUKI, KAZUHIRO,C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OKADA, YUUJI,C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIYAZAWA, KENICHI/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IZUMI, HAJIME,C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUENAGA, KIYOSHI,C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOMINAGA, TETSUO,C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KONDOU, FUMIO,C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES

2007-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAENO, MASASHI,C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051108

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 1/00 A, 7F 24F 13/24 B, 7F 04D 17/04 B

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI