Global Patent Index - EP 1243865 A2

EP 1243865 A2 2002-09-25 - Device to drain the condensation water in air conditioners

Title (en)

Device to drain the condensation water in air conditioners

Title (de)

Kondenswassersammel- und -ableitvorrichtung einer Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de drainage des eaux de condensation dans un dispositif de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1243865 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02425107 A

Priority

IT BS20010033 U

Abstract (en)

Device for draining condensation water for air conditioning units (1) comprising at least an internal unit (2) in which said condensation water is generated, and an external unit (3) equipped at least with a condenser (13) for the frigorific fluid and with a fan (15) generating a forced air flow through said condenser (13), characterized in that it comprises a conveyor (18) putting into fluid communication said internal unit (2) with said external unit (3) so as to convey the condensation water generated in said internal unit (2) onto said condenser (13) of said external unit (3). The conveyor (18) comprises at least a draining tube (19) for condensation water connecting the internal unit (2) with the external unit (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/22 (2006.01); F25B 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/42 (2013.01); F24F 13/222 (2013.01); F24F 2013/225 (2013.01); F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F25B 2339/041 (2013.01); F25D 2321/1412 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243865 A2 20020925; EP 1243865 A3 20030723; IT BS20010033 U1 20020920

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040124

2004-05-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 13/22 A

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 1/00 B

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI