Global Patent Index - EP 1243868 A2

EP 1243868 A2 2002-09-25 - Mounting unit for the wall mounting of a heater like a boiler, storage heater or mixed boiler

Title (en)

Mounting unit for the wall mounting of a heater like a boiler, storage heater or mixed boiler

Title (de)

Montageeinheit zur Wandbefestigung eines Heizgerätes wie Therme, Speichergerät oder Kombigerät

Title (fr)

Unité de montage pour fixation contre le mur d'une chaudiére comme chauffe-eau instantanée, accumulateur de chaleur ou chaudiére mixte

Publication

EP 1243868 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01123488 A

Priority

DE 10114506 A

Abstract (en)

The mounting plate has beveled side edges (17) and supports fixture-holes(21-23) for the heater and is connected to a heater-fittings-holder. The mounting plate is divided into two mirror-image part-plates (10.1,10.2) each of which is joined vertically in at least two positions to an extension plate (11.1,11.2). The top edge parts of the two mounting plates are joined by means of an appliance support (20.1) at horizontal distances apart corresponding to several different widths of heaters. The bottom edge parts of the mounting plate has a connecting-strip (20.2) and or a fittings (32-34)-support (30.1,30.2) joining the two mounting plate parts at the same horizontal distance apart.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Montageeinheit zur Wandbefestigung eines Heizgerätes, wie Therme, Speichergerät oder Kombigerät, bestehend aus einer an der Wand befestigbaren Montageplatte mit abgekanteten Seitenrändern, die Befestigungsaufnahmen für die Befestigungsmittel des Heizgerätes trägt und mit einem Armaturenträger verbindbar oder verbunden ist, der mit den für den Anschluss des Heizgerätes benötigten Armaturen bestückt ist. Durch Aufteilung der Montageplatte in zwei Teilmontageplatten mit zugehörigen Verlängerungsplatten und ihre stufige Veränderung in horizontaler und vertikaler Richtung wird eine an unterschiedliche Heizgeräte anpassbare Montageeinheit geschaffen, die zudem mit einem Armaturenträger verbindbar ist, der mit den für das angebrachte Heizgerät erforderlichen Armaturen bestückt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/06; F24H 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/06 (2006.01); F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/122 (2013.01); F24H 9/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243868 A2 20020925; EP 1243868 A3 20040331; EP 1243868 B1 20061102; DE 10114506 A1 20020926; DE 50111360 D1 20061214; ES 2274844 T3 20070601

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160928

2017-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160928

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111360

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150929

2016-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161027

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2274844 T3

2007-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070208

2006-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111360 P 20061214

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI